TN HB0194 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-09 - Assigned to s/c Departments & Agencies Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 14 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-09 - Assigned to s/c Departments & Agencies Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, authorizes the River Breeze Drive-In and Event Venue in Knoxville to serve alcoholic beverages for consumption on the premises. - Amends TCA Section 57-4-102.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Section 57-4-102, relative to consumption of alcoholic beverages on the premises.
Sponsors
Rep. Dave Wright [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-09 | House | Assigned to s/c Departments & Agencies Subcommittee |
2021-02-08 | House | Withdrawn. |
2021-02-08 | House | P2C, ref. to State Government Committee |
2021-01-15 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2021-01-14 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB0179 (Crossfiled) 2021-02-25 - Withdrawn.