TN HB0174 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Enrolled on May 8 2019 - 75% progression
Action: 2019-05-16 - Transmitted to Governor for his action.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, transfers the fire investigations section from the department of commerce and insurance to the bureau. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 38, Chapter 6 and Title 68, Chapter 102.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As introduced, transfers the fire investigations section from the department of commerce and insurance to the bureau. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 38, Chapter 6 and Title 68, Chapter 102.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-01 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Third Consideration (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-22 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-16HouseTransmitted to Governor for his action.
2019-05-14SenateSigned by Senate Speaker
2019-05-10HouseSigned by H. Speaker
2019-05-08HouseEnrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker.
2019-05-01SenatePassed Senate, Ayes 33, Nays 0
2019-05-01SenateAmendment withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - SA0247)
2019-05-01SenateSenate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill.
2019-04-24SenateReceived from House, Passed on First Consideration
2019-04-23HouseEngrossed; ready for transmission to Sen.
2019-04-22HousePassed H., as am., Ayes 97, Nays 0, PNV 0
2019-04-22HouseH. adopted am. (Amendment 1 - HA0430)
2019-04-18HouseH. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/22/2019
2019-04-17HousePlaced on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/18/2019
2019-04-17HouseRec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee
2019-04-17HousePlaced on cal. Finance, Ways, and Means Committee for 4/17/2019
2019-04-17HouseRec. for pass by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
2019-04-16HousePlaced on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 4/17/2019
2019-04-16HouseAssigned to s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee
2019-04-16HouseRec. for pass; ref to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
2019-04-16HousePlaced on cal. Government Operations Committee for 4/16/2019
2019-04-16HouseRec. for pass. if am., ref. to Government Operations Committee
2019-04-10HousePlaced on cal. State Committee for 4/16/2019
2019-04-09HouseNo Action Taken
2019-04-03HousePlaced on cal. State Committee for 4/9/2019
2019-04-03HouseRec for pass if am by s/c ref. to State Committee
2019-03-27HousePlaced on s/c cal Departments & Agencies Subcommittee for 4/3/2019
2019-02-01HouseAssigned to s/c Departments & Agencies Subcommittee
2019-01-31HouseP2C, ref. to State Committee-- Government Operations for Review
2019-01-30HouseIntro., P1C.
2019-01-28HouseFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

SB0251 (Crossfiled) 2019-05-01 - Companion House Bill substituted

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback