TN HB0160 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 28 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-27 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Elections & Campaign Finance Subcommittee of Local Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 28 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-27 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Elections & Campaign Finance Subcommittee of Local Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, authorizes voting to occur at institutions designated for elderly or disabled persons that have a qualified staff who regularly assess residents and attest that the population consists of persons of which at least 35 percent are frail, as defined by federal law. - Amends TCA Title 2 and Title 68.
Title
As introduced, authorizes voting to occur at institutions designated for elderly or disabled persons that have a qualified staff who regularly assess residents and attest that the population consists of persons of which at least 35 percent are frail, as defined by federal law. - Amends TCA Title 2 and Title 68.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-27 | House | Taken off notice for cal in s/c Elections & Campaign Finance Subcommittee of Local Committee |
2019-02-20 | House | Placed on s/c cal Elections & Campaign Finance Subcommittee for 2/27/2019 |
2019-02-01 | House | Assigned to s/c Elections & Campaign Finance Subcommittee |
2019-01-31 | House | P2C, ref. to Local Committee |
2019-01-30 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2019-01-28 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB0192 (Crossfiled) 2019-02-26 - Failed in Senate State and Local Government Committee / no second