TN HB0149 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-01-24 - Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, makes appropriations for the purpose of defraying the expenses of certain legislative enactments passed during the 2023 session of the 113th General Assembly; earmarks sufficient state funds for the purpose of funding any bill naming a highway or bridge in honor of a service member killed in action.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT to make appropriations for the purpose of defraying the expenses of the state government for the fiscal years beginning July 1, 2022, and July 1, 2023, in the administration, operation, and maintenance of the legislative, executive, and judicial branches of the various departments, institutions, offices, and agencies of the state; for certain state aid and obligations; for capital outlay, for the service of the public debt, for emergency and contingency; to repeal certain appropriations and any acts inconsistent herewith; to provide provisional continuing appropriations; and to establish certain provisions, limitations, and restrictions under which appropriations may be obligated and expended. This act makes appropriations for the purposes described above for the fiscal years beginning July 1, 2022, and July 1, 2023.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2023-01-24HouseAssigned to s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee
2023-01-20HouseP2C, ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
2023-01-12HouseIntro., P1C.
2023-01-11HouseFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

SB0116 (Crossfiled) 2023-04-18 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback