TN HB0143 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-01-24 - Assigned to s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-01-24 - Assigned to s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires a magistrate to order a defendant charged with the offense of aggravated assault or assault of a first responder that involves strangulation of the victim to post bail to reasonably ensure the appearance of the defendant as required and the safety of the community, in addition to any other conditions of release imposed. - Amends TCA Title 39 and Title 40.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 39 and Title 40, relative to offenses involving strangulation.
Sponsors
Rep. Greg Martin [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-01-24 | House | Assigned to s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee |
2023-01-20 | House | P2C, ref. to Criminal Justice Committee |
2023-01-12 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2023-01-11 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB0101 (Crossfiled) 2023-03-28 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Judiciary Committee