TN HB0139 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-13 - Failed for lack of second in: Life & Health Insurance Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, requires health insurance to cover acupuncture services as a benefit beginning January 1, 2020. - Amends TCA Title 56, Chapter 7.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As introduced, requires health insurance to cover acupuncture services as a benefit beginning January 1, 2020. - Amends TCA Title 56, Chapter 7.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-13HouseFailed for lack of second in: Life & Health Insurance Subcommittee
2019-03-06HousePlaced on s/c cal Life & Health Insurance Subcommittee for 3/13/2019
2019-02-27HouseMeeting Canceled
2019-02-20HousePlaced on s/c cal Life & Health Insurance Subcommittee for 2/27/2019
2019-01-30HouseAssigned to s/c Life & Health Insurance Subcommittee
2019-01-30HouseP2C, ref. to Insurance Committee
2019-01-28HouseIntro., P1C.
2019-01-24HouseFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

SB0838 (Crossfiled) 2019-03-27 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Commerce & Labor Committee

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback