TN HB0119 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-12 - Rec. for pass; ref to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
Pending: House Finance, Ways & Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, names the visitor center at the Tipton-Haynes Historic Site in Johnson City in honor of Penny McLaughlin.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As introduced, names the visitor center at the Tipton-Haynes Historic Site in Johnson City in honor of Penny McLaughlin.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-12HouseRec. for pass; ref to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
2019-03-06HousePlaced on cal. Naming, Designating, & Private Acts Committee for 3/12/2019
2019-01-30HouseP2C, ref. to Naming, Designating, & Private Acts Committee
2019-01-28HouseIntro., P1C.
2019-01-24HouseFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

SB0021 (Crossfiled) 2019-03-21 - Sponsor(s) Added.

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback