TN HB0116 | 2011-2012 | 107th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-04 - Taken Off Notice For Cal. in s/c C&EA Subcommittee of Consumer & Employee Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-04 - Taken Off Notice For Cal. in s/c C&EA Subcommittee of Consumer & Employee Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires any gift card or prepaid card issued as payment of a rebate to contain an expiration date conspicuously printed on the card. - Amends TCA Title 47, Chapter 18, Part 1.
Title
As introduced, requires any gift card or prepaid card issued as payment of a rebate to contain an expiration date conspicuously printed on the card. - Amends TCA Title 47, Chapter 18, Part 1.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-04 | Taken Off Notice For Cal. in s/c C&EA Subcommittee of Consumer & Employee Affairs Committee | |
2012-03-28 | Placed on s/c cal C&EA Subcommittee for 4/4/2012 | |
2012-03-21 | Mtg. Cancelled Action Def. in s/c C&EA Subcommittee to 3/28/12 | |
2012-03-14 | Placed on s/c cal C&EA Subcommittee for 3/21/2012 | |
2012-03-14 | Action Def. in s/c C&EA Subcommittee to 3/21/2012 | |
2012-03-07 | Placed on s/c cal C&EA Subcommittee for 3/14/2012 | |
2011-04-13 | Action Def. in s/c C&EA Subcommittee to 2012 | |
2011-04-06 | Placed on s/c cal C&EA Subcommittee for 4/13/2011 | |
2011-04-06 | Action Def. in s/c C&EA Subcommittee to 4/13/2011 | |
2011-03-30 | Placed on s/c cal C&EA Subcommittee for 4/6/2011 | |
2011-03-30 | Action Def. in s/c C&EA Subcommittee to 4/6/2011 | |
2011-03-23 | Placed on s/c cal C&EA Subcommittee for 3/30/2011 | |
2011-02-09 | Assigned to s/c General Sub of C&EA | |
2011-02-09 | P2C, ref. to Consumer & Employees Affairs Committee | |
2011-02-07 | Intro., P1C. | |
2011-01-18 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB0094 (Crossfiled) 2011-02-09 - P2C, ref. to S. C,L&A Comm.
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=HB0116&ga=107 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/107/Bill/HB0116.pdf |