TN HB0104 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Passed on May 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-09 - Pub. Ch. 222
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Passed on May 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-09 - Pub. Ch. 222
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, deletes age requirement and certain other requirements for persons practicing ultrasound sonography in a nonclinical 3D/4D ultrasound boutique setting. - Amends TCA Title 63.
Title
As enacted, deletes age requirement and certain other requirements for persons practicing ultrasound sonography in a nonclinical 3D/4D ultrasound boutique setting. - Amends TCA Title 63.
Sponsors
Rep. Chris Todd [R] | Rep. Dave Wright [R] | Rep. Tom Leatherwood [R] | Rep. Esther Helton-Haynes [R] |
Rep. Robin Smith [R] | Rep. Ron Gant [R] | Rep. Bruce Griffey [R] | Rep. Scott Cepicky [R] |
Rep. Martin Daniel [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-04-15 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Third Consideration (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-18 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-18 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-09 | Pub. Ch. 222 | |
2019-05-09 | Effective date(s) 04/30/2019 | |
2019-04-30 | Signed by Governor. | |
2019-04-23 | House | Transmitted to Governor for his action. |
2019-04-22 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2019-04-18 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2019-04-17 | House | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Passed Senate, Ayes 31, Nays 0 |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Amendment withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - SA0309) |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Senate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill. |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Received from House, Passed on First Consideration |
2019-03-19 | House | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. |
2019-03-18 | House | Passed H., as am., Ayes 98, Nays 0, PNV 0 |
2019-03-18 | House | H. adopted am. (Amendment 1 - HA0062) |
2019-03-14 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 3/18/2019 |
2019-03-13 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/14/2019 |
2019-03-12 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2019-03-06 | House | Placed on cal. Health Committee for 3/12/2019 |
2019-03-05 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Health Committee |
2019-02-27 | House | Placed on s/c cal Facilities, Licensure, & Regulations Subcommittee for 3/5/2019 |
2019-02-27 | House | Assigned to s/c Facilities, Licensure, & Regulations Subcommittee |
2019-02-27 | House | Ref. to Health Committee |
2019-01-28 | House | P2C, caption bill, held on desk - pending amdt. |
2019-01-24 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2019-01-23 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB0266 (Crossfiled) 2019-05-09 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 222