TN HB0099 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 3 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-03 - Effective date(s) 4/20/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 3 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-03 - Effective date(s) 4/20/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, authorizes a state department or agency to update signage on state property indicating accessibility for persons with disabilities within existing resources. - Amends TCA Title 12, Chapter 2, Part 1.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 12, Chapter 2, Part 1, relative to the dynamic accessibility symbol.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-29 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-22 - House - FLOOR VOTE: CONSENT CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-22 - House - FLOOR VOTE: CONSENT CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-03 | Effective date(s) 4/20/2021 | |
2021-05-03 | Pub. Ch. 173 | |
2021-04-20 | Signed by Governor. | |
2021-04-08 | House | Transmitted to Governor for his action. |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2021-04-05 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2021-03-31 | House | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Passed Senate, Ayes 32, Nays 0 |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Senate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill. |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Received from House, Passed on First Consideration |
2021-03-23 | House | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. |
2021-03-22 | House | Passed H., Ayes 96, Nays 0, PNV 1 |
2021-03-18 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-03-18 | House | H. Placed on Consent Calendar for 3/22/2021 |
2021-03-17 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/18/2021 |
2021-03-16 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2021-03-10 | House | Placed on cal. Finance, Ways, and Means Committee for 3/16/2021 |
2021-03-10 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2021-03-03 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 3/10/2021 |
2021-03-03 | House | Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee |
2021-03-02 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2021-02-25 | House | Placed on cal. State Government Committee for 3/2/2021 |
2021-02-24 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to State Government Committee |
2021-02-17 | House | Placed on s/c cal Public Service Subcommittee for 2/24/2021 |
2021-02-17 | House | Meeting Canceled |
2021-02-10 | House | Placed on s/c cal Public Service Subcommittee for 2/17/2021 |
2021-01-27 | House | Assigned to s/c Public Service Subcommittee |
2021-01-13 | House | Ref. to State Government Committee |
2021-01-13 | House | P2C held on desk. |
2021-01-12 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2021-01-06 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB0245 (Crossfiled) 2021-05-03 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 173