TN HB0085 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 20 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-20 - Failed in s/c Property & Planning Subcommittee of Local Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 20 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-20 - Failed in s/c Property & Planning Subcommittee of Local Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, classifies time-share and vacation club property that includes an interest in real property as residential property for property tax purposes. - Amends TCA Title 67, Chapter 5.
Title
As introduced, classifies time-share and vacation club property that includes an interest in real property as residential property for property tax purposes. - Amends TCA Title 67, Chapter 5.
Sponsors
Rep. Gary Hicks [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-03-20 - House - HOUSE PROPERTY & PLANNING SUBCOMMITTEE: Failed (Y: 1 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-20 | House | Failed in s/c Property & Planning Subcommittee of Local Committee |
2019-03-13 | House | Placed on s/c cal Property & Planning Subcommittee for 3/20/2019 |
2019-01-30 | House | Assigned to s/c Property & Planning Subcommittee |
2019-01-28 | House | P2C, ref. to Local Committee |
2019-01-24 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2019-01-23 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB0437 (Crossfiled) 2019-03-22 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate State & Local Government Committee