TN HB0077 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 5 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-02-17 - Placed on s/c cal Banking & Consumer Affairs Subcommittee for 2/24/2021
Pending: House Banking & Consumer Affairs Subcommittee Committee
Hearing: Feb 24 @ 5:00 pm in House Hearing Room III
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, authorizes a state bank to request from the commissioner a waiver or modification of certain terms and conditions applicable to a national bank; authorizes a state bank to request from the commissioner authority to exercise certain incidental powers or engage in certain incidental activities; requires commissioner to publish a summary of applications made for waiver, modification, or authorization. - Amends TCA Section 45-2-601.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Section 45-2-601, relative to banking.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-17HousePlaced on s/c cal Banking & Consumer Affairs Subcommittee for 2/24/2021
2021-02-17HouseMeeting Canceled
2021-02-10HousePlaced on s/c cal Banking & Consumer Affairs Subcommittee for 2/17/2021
2021-01-27HouseAssigned to s/c Banking & Consumer Affairs Subcommittee
2021-01-13HouseRef. to Commerce Committee
2021-01-13HouseP2C held on desk.
2021-01-12HouseIntro., P1C.
2021-01-05HouseFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

SB0745 (Crossfiled) 2021-02-11 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Commerce and Labor Committee

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback