TN HB0077 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 50-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-02-20 - Placed on cal. Health Committee for 2/26/2019
Pending: House Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, prohibits abortions from the point a fetal heartbeat is detected; creates exceptions. - Amends TCA Title 39, Chapter 15, Part 2 and Title 68, Chapter 11, Part 2.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As introduced, prohibits abortions from the point a fetal heartbeat is detected; creates exceptions. - Amends TCA Title 39, Chapter 15, Part 2 and Title 68, Chapter 11, Part 2.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-20HousePlaced on cal. Health Committee for 2/26/2019
2019-02-20HouseRec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Health Committee
2019-02-19HouseSponsor(s) Added.
2019-02-14HouseSponsor(s) Added.
2019-02-13HousePlaced on s/c cal Public Health Subcommittee for 2/20/2019
2019-02-11HouseSponsor(s) Added.
2019-02-06HouseSponsor(s) Added.
2019-02-05HouseSponsor(s) Added.
2019-02-04HouseSponsor(s) Added.
2019-01-31HouseSponsor(s) Added.
2019-01-30HouseSponsor(s) Added.
2019-01-30HouseAssigned to s/c Public Health Subcommittee
2019-01-28HouseSponsor(s) Added.
2019-01-28HouseP2C, ref. to Health Committee
2019-01-24HouseSponsor(s) Added.
2019-01-24HouseIntro., P1C.
2019-01-23HouseSponsor(s) Added.
2019-01-23HouseFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

SB1236 (Crossfiled) 2019-02-11 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback