TN HB0075 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on March 29 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-29 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 36
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on March 29 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-29 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 36
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, authorizes the use of interest and principal deposited into certain special trust funds, which hold proceeds from the sale of certain public property, for capital maintenance of property controlled by the department of intellectual and developmental disabilities and other related purposes. - Amends TCA Section 12-2-117.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Section 12-2-117, relative to the sale of public property.
Sponsors
Rep. William Lamberth [R] | Rep. Ron Gant [R] | Rep. Kent Calfee [R] | Rep. Chris Todd [R] |
Rep. Patsy Hazlewood [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-29 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 36 | |
2021-03-08 | House | Comp. SB subst. |
2021-03-08 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-03-04 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 3/8/2021 |
2021-03-03 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/4/2021 |
2021-03-02 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2021-02-24 | House | Placed on cal. Finance, Ways, and Means Committee for 3/2/2021 |
2021-02-24 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2021-02-17 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 2/24/2021 |
2021-02-17 | House | Meeting Canceled |
2021-02-10 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 2/17/2021 |
2021-02-08 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-01-27 | House | Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee |
2021-01-13 | House | Ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2021-01-13 | House | P2C held on desk. |
2021-01-12 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2021-01-05 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB0744 (Crossfiled) 2021-03-29 - Effective date(s) 07/01/2021