TN HB0069 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 5 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Caption bill, held on desk - pending amdt.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, creates a Class D felony for a person to knowingly and with unlawful intent possess a telecommunication device while present in any penal institution without the express written consent of the chief administrator of the institution. - Amends TCA Title 39.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 39, relative to criminal offenses.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-01-13HouseCaption bill, held on desk - pending amdt.
2021-01-13HouseP2C held on desk.
2021-01-12HouseIntro., P1C.
2021-01-05HouseFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

SB0733 (Crossfiled) 2021-02-11 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback