TN HB0063 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 5 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Caption bill, held on desk - pending amdt.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, requires the department to submit a report to the judiciary committees of the senate and house of representatives on or before December 31, 2022, regarding the implementation of the Family First Prevention Services Act. - Amends TCA Title 37.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 37, relative to the implementation of the Family First Prevention Services Act.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-01-13HouseCaption bill, held on desk - pending amdt.
2021-01-13HouseP2C held on desk.
2021-01-12HouseIntro., P1C.
2021-01-05HouseFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

SB0721 (Crossfiled) 2021-02-11 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback