TN HB0045 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 14-2)
Status: Passed on April 19 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-19 - Pub. Ch. 99
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 14-2)
Status: Passed on April 19 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-19 - Pub. Ch. 99
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, revises provisions governing physical activity requirements for students. - Amends TCA Title 49, Chapter 6.
Title
As enacted, revises provisions governing physical activity requirements for students. - Amends TCA Title 49, Chapter 6.
Sponsors
Rep. Bill Dunn [R] | Rep. Jason Zachary [R] | Rep. David Byrd [R] | Rep. Roger Kane [R] |
Rep. Sheila Butt [R] | Rep. Joe Pitts [D] | Rep. Eddie Smith [R] | Rep. Rick Staples [D] |
Rep. Martin Daniel [R] | Rep. Courtney Rogers [R] | Rep. Sam Whitson [R] | Rep. Tim Rudd [R] |
Rep. Timothy Wirgau [R] | Rep. David Alexander [R] | Rep. Mark White [R] | Rep. Jimmy Eldridge [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-03-20 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-16 - House - FLOOR VOTE: AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-16 - House - FLOOR VOTE: AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-19 | Pub. Ch. 99 | |
2017-04-19 | Effective date(s) 04/04/2017 | |
2017-04-05 | Signed by Governor. | |
2017-03-27 | House | Transmitted to Governor for his action. |
2017-03-23 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2017-03-23 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2017-03-21 | House | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. |
2017-03-20 | Senate | Passed Senate, Ayes 31, Nays 0 |
2017-03-20 | Senate | Amendment withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - SA0101) |
2017-03-20 | Senate | Senate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill. |
2017-03-20 | Senate | Received from House, Passed on First Consideration |
2017-03-16 | House | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. |
2017-03-16 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2017-03-16 | House | Passed H., as am., Ayes 91, Nays 0, PNV 0 |
2017-03-16 | House | H. adopted am. (Amendment 2 - HA0099) |
2017-03-16 | House | H. adopted am. (Amendment 1 - HA0019) |
2017-03-15 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2017-03-13 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 3/16/2017 |
2017-03-09 | House | Held on desk. |
2017-03-09 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2017-03-02 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 3/9/2017 |
2017-03-01 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/2/2017 |
2017-02-28 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2017-02-22 | House | Placed on cal. Education Instruction & Programs for 2/28/2017 |
2017-02-22 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2017-02-15 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Education Instruction & Programs |
2017-02-15 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2017-02-08 | House | Placed on s/c cal Education Instruction & Programs Subcommittee for 2/15/2017 |
2017-02-01 | House | Assigned to s/c Education Instruction & Programs Subcommittee |
2017-02-01 | House | P2C, ref. to Education Instruction & Programs |
2017-01-30 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2017-01-30 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2017-01-13 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB0662 (Crossfiled) 2017-04-19 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 99