TN HB0044 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 2 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-02 - Effective date(s) 04/28/2023
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 2 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-02 - Effective date(s) 04/28/2023
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, authorizes the City of McEwen and cities in Henry, Benton, Lewis, Grainger, and Hardeman counties to hold a referendum to authorize the manufacture, receipt, sale, storage, transportation, distribution, and possession of alcoholic beverages within the territorial limits of the respective city. - Amends TCA Section 57-3-106.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Section 57-3-106, relative to alcoholic beverages.
Sponsors
Rep. Jay Reedy [R] |
Roll Calls
2023-04-10 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Third Consideration (Y: 28 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-13 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 88 N: 6 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-13 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 88 N: 6 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-02 | Effective date(s) 04/28/2023 | |
2023-05-02 | Pub. Ch. 291 | |
2023-04-28 | Signed by Governor. | |
2023-04-18 | House | Transmitted to Governor for his action. |
2023-04-17 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2023-04-17 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2023-04-11 | House | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. |
2023-04-10 | Senate | Passed Senate, Ayes 28, Nays 2, PNV 2 |
2023-04-10 | Senate | Senate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill. |
2023-03-16 | Senate | Received from House, Passed on First Consideration |
2023-03-14 | House | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. |
2023-03-13 | House | Passed H., Ayes 88, Nays 6, PNV 2 |
2023-03-09 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 3/13/2023 |
2023-03-08 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/9/2023 |
2023-03-08 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2023-03-01 | House | Placed on cal. State Government Committee for 3/8/2023 |
2023-03-01 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to State Government Committee |
2023-02-22 | House | Placed on s/c cal Departments & Agencies Subcommittee for 3/1/2023 |
2023-01-12 | House | Assigned to s/c Departments & Agencies Subcommittee |
2023-01-12 | House | Ref. to State Government Committee |
2023-01-11 | House | P2C held on desk, pending appointment of Standing Committees |
2023-01-10 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2023-01-09 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB1452 (Crossfiled) 2023-05-02 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 291