TN HB0034 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 3 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-03 - Pub. Ch. 183
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 3 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-03 - Pub. Ch. 183
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, revises provisions governing areas where and times when off-highway vehicles may be operated on roads. - Amends TCA Section 55-8-185.
Title
As enacted, revises provisions governing areas where and times when off-highway vehicles may be operated on roads. - Amends TCA Section 55-8-185.
Sponsors
Rep. John Windle [D] | Rep. John Ragan [R] | Rep. Kent Calfee [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-04-13 - House - FLOOR VOTE: CONCUR IN SENATE AMENDMENT # 2 (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-06 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION AMENDED (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-13 - House - FLOOR VOTE: AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-06 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION AMENDED (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-13 - House - FLOOR VOTE: AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-03 | Pub. Ch. 183 | |
2017-05-03 | Effective date(s) 04/27/2017 | |
2017-04-27 | Signed by Governor. | |
2017-04-18 | House | Transmitted to Governor for his action. |
2017-04-18 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2017-04-17 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2017-04-13 | House | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. |
2017-04-13 | House | H. concurred in S. am. no. 2 Ayes 90, Nays 0 PNV 0 HB0034 |
2017-04-10 | House | H. Placed on Message Calendar for 4/13/2017 |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Passed Senate as amended, Ayes 29, Nays 0 |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Senate adopted Amendment (Amendment 2 - SA0197) |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Amendment withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - SA0196) |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Senate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill. |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Received from House, Passed on First Consideration |
2017-03-14 | House | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. |
2017-03-13 | House | Passed H., as am., Ayes 94, Nays 0, PNV 0 |
2017-03-13 | House | H. adopted am. (Amendment 1 - HA0003) |
2017-03-09 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 3/13/2017 |
2017-03-08 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/9/2017 |
2017-02-21 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2017-02-15 | House | Placed on cal. Transportation Committee for 2/21/2017 |
2017-02-15 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Transportation Committee |
2017-02-08 | House | Placed on s/c cal Transportation Subcommittee for 2/15/2017 |
2017-02-08 | House | Action Def. in s/c Transportation Subcommittee to 2/15/2017 |
2017-02-07 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2017-02-01 | House | Placed on s/c cal Transportation Subcommittee for 2/8/2017 |
2017-01-31 | House | Assigned to s/c Transportation Subcommittee |
2017-01-30 | House | P2C, ref. to Transportation Committee |
2017-01-12 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2017-01-11 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB0679 (Crossfiled) 2017-05-03 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 183