TN HB0029 | 2011-2012 | 107th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 27 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-02-27 - Withdrawn.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 27 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-02-27 - Withdrawn.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, increases the penalty for the offense of arson from a Class C to a Class B felony and sets a minimum fine for arson of a place of worship at $25,000 and aggravated arson at $50,000. - Amends TCA Title 39, Chapter 14.
Title
As introduced, increases the penalty for the offense of arson from a Class C to a Class B felony and sets a minimum fine for arson of a place of worship at $25,000 and aggravated arson at $50,000. - Amends TCA Title 39, Chapter 14.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-02-27 | Withdrawn. | |
2012-02-22 | Taken Off Notice For Cal. in s/c Judiciary Subcommittee of Judiciary Committee | |
2012-02-15 | Placed on s/c cal Judiciary Subcommittee for 2/22/2012 | |
2011-02-08 | Assigned to s/c General Sub of Judiciary | |
2011-01-13 | Ref. to Judiciary Committee | |
2011-01-13 | P2C held on desk pending the appointment of standing committees. | |
2011-01-12 | Intro., P1C. | |
2011-01-11 | Filed for intro. |
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=HB0029&ga=107 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/107/Bill/HB0029.pdf |