TN HB0028 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 11-0)
Status: Introduced on January 4 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-11 - Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 4/16/2024
Pending: House Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, deletes requirement that municipalities adopt a comprehensive growth plan and have an approved urban growth boundary prior to annexing unincorporated territory. - Amends TCA Title 4, Chapter 10; Title 6; Title 7; Title 13; Title 49 and Title 65, Chapter 4.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 4, Chapter 10; Title 6; Title 7; Title 13; Title 49 and Title 65, Chapter 4, relative to comprehensive growth plans.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2024-04-11HousePlaced on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 4/16/2024
2024-01-24HousePlaced behind the budget
2024-01-23HouseSponsor(s) Added.
2024-01-17HousePlaced on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 1/24/2024
2023-04-05HouseAction Def. in s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee to First Calendar of 2024
2023-03-29HousePlaced on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 4/5/2023
2023-03-29HouseAssigned to s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee
2023-03-28HouseRec. for pass. if am., ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
2023-03-22HousePlaced on cal. Local Government Committee for 3/28/2023
2023-03-21HouseAction def. in Local Government Committee to 3/28/2023
2023-03-15HousePlaced on cal. Local Government Committee for 3/21/2023
2023-03-14HouseAction def. in Local Government Committee to 3/21/2023
2023-03-08HousePlaced on cal. Local Government Committee for 3/14/2023
2023-03-08HouseRec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Local Government Committee
2023-03-06HouseSponsor(s) Added.
2023-03-01HousePlaced on s/c cal Property & Planning Subcommittee for 3/8/2023
2023-01-21HouseSponsor(s) Added.
2023-01-12HouseSponsor(s) Added.
2023-01-12HouseAssigned to s/c Property & Planning Subcommittee
2023-01-12HouseRef. to Local Government Committee
2023-01-11HouseP2C held on desk, pending appointment of Standing Committees
2023-01-10HouseIntro., P1C.
2023-01-04HouseFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

SB0075 (Crossfiled) 2023-03-29 - Action deferred in Senate State and Local Government Committee to first calendar of 2024

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback