TN HB0024 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-07 - Withdrawn.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-07 - Withdrawn.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires a court to review a criminal history records check and, in certain cases, an independent credit report before appointing a proposed conservator; requires an appointed conservator to complete educational training within 30 days of appointment. - Amends TCA Title 34 and Title 35.
Title
As introduced, requires a court to review a criminal history records check and, in certain cases, an independent credit report before appointing a proposed conservator; requires an appointed conservator to complete educational training within 30 days of appointment. - Amends TCA Title 34 and Title 35.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-07 | House | Withdrawn. |
2019-01-18 | House | Assigned to s/c Children & Families Subcommittee |
2019-01-10 | House | Ref. to Judiciary |
2019-01-10 | House | P2C held on desk. |
2019-01-09 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2019-01-08 | House | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=HB0024&ga=111 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/111/Bill/HB0024.pdf |