TN HB0024 | 2015-2016 | 109th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-2)
Status: Passed on June 2 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-02 - Pub. Ch. 500
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-2)
Status: Passed on June 2 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-02 - Pub. Ch. 500
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, enacts the "Go Build Tennessee Act." - Amends TCA Title 4 and Title 62, Chapter 6.
Title
As enacted, enacts the "Go Build Tennessee Act." - Amends TCA Title 4 and Title 62, Chapter 6.
Sponsors
Rep. Ryan Williams [R] | Rep. Marc Gravitt [R] | Rep. Patsy Hazlewood [R] | Rep. G.A. Hardaway [D] |
Rep. Harry Brooks [R] | Rep. Curry Todd [R] | Rep. Johnnie Turner [D] | Rep. Barry Doss [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-04-22 - House - FLOOR VOTE: AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-22 - House - FLOOR VOTE: CONCUR IN SENATE AMENDMENT # 6 (Y: 87 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-22 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION AMENDED (Y: 26 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-22 - House - FLOOR VOTE: CONCUR IN SENATE AMENDMENT # 6 (Y: 87 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-22 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION AMENDED (Y: 26 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-02 | Pub. Ch. 500 | |
2015-06-02 | Effective date(s) 05/20/2015 | |
2015-05-20 | Signed by Governor. | |
2015-05-08 | House | Transmitted to Governor for his action. |
2015-05-07 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2015-05-06 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2015-04-27 | House | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. |
2015-04-22 | House | H. concurred in S. am. no. 6 |
2015-04-22 | House | H. Placed on Message Calendar 2 for 4/22/2015 |
2015-04-22 | Senate | Passed Senate as amended, Ayes 26, Nays 2, PNV 1 |
2015-04-22 | Senate | Amendment withdrawn. (Amendment 5 - SA0475) |
2015-04-22 | Senate | Amendment withdrawn. (Amendment 2 - SA0260) |
2015-04-22 | Senate | Senate adopted Amendment (Amendment 6 - SA0480) |
2015-04-22 | Senate | Amendment withdrawn. (Amendment 4 - SA0466) |
2015-04-22 | Senate | Amendment withdrawn. (Amendment 3 - SA0445) |
2015-04-22 | Senate | Amendment withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - SA0259) |
2015-04-22 | Senate | Senate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill. |
2015-04-22 | Senate | Received from House, Passed on First Consideration |
2015-04-22 | House | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. |
2015-04-22 | House | Passed H., as am., Ayes 95, Nays 0, PNV 0 |
2015-04-22 | House | H. adopted am. (Amendment 3 - HA0505) |
2015-04-22 | House | H. adopted am. (Amendment 2 - HA0506) |
2015-04-22 | House | H. adopted am. (Amendment 1 - HA0290) |
2015-04-22 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2015-04-21 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/22/2015 |
2015-04-21 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/21/2015 |
2015-04-21 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2015-04-21 | House | Placed on cal. Finance, Ways & Means Committee for 4/21/2015 |
2015-04-21 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee |
2015-04-17 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 4/21/2015 |
2015-04-14 | House | Placed behind the budget |
2015-04-09 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2015-04-08 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 4/15/2015 |
2015-04-07 | House | Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee |
2015-04-01 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee |
2015-03-25 | House | Placed on cal. Business and Utilities Committee for 4/1/2015 |
2015-03-25 | House | Action def. in Business and Utilities Committee to 4/1/2015 |
2015-03-18 | House | Placed on cal. Business and Utilities Committee for 3/25/2015 |
2015-03-17 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Business and Utilities Committee |
2015-03-11 | House | Placed on s/c cal Business and Utilities Subcommittee for 3/17/2015 |
2015-03-03 | House | Taken off notice for cal in s/c Business and Utilities Subcommittee of Business and Utilities Committee |
2015-02-25 | House | Placed on s/c cal Business and Utilities Subcommittee for 3/3/2015 |
2015-02-24 | House | Taken off notice for cal in s/c Business and Utilities Subcommittee of Business and Utilities Committee |
2015-02-19 | House | Placed on s/c cal Business and Utilities Subcommittee for 2/24/2015 |
2015-02-17 | House | Meeting Cancelled. Reset on Business and Utilities Subcommittee cal. for next meeting. |
2015-02-11 | House | Placed on s/c cal Business and Utilities Subcommittee for 2/17/2015 |
2015-01-17 | House | Assigned to s/c Business and Utilities Subcommittee |
2015-01-17 | House | Ref. to Business and Utilities Committee |
2015-01-15 | House | P2C, held on desk - pending appointment of standing committees |
2015-01-14 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2015-01-13 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB0127 (Crossfiled) 2015-06-02 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 500