TN HB0021 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on December 3 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-10 - Withdrawn.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on December 3 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-10 - Withdrawn.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires this state to refuse to consent to receive any refugees for purposes of resettlement; requires each local government within this state to refuse to consent to receive any refugees for purposes of resettlement unless resettlement within its jurisdiction is approved by a certain process. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 5; Title 6 and Title 7.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 4; Title 5; Title 6 and Title 7, relative to refugee resettlement.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-10 | House | Withdrawn. |
2021-01-27 | House | Assigned to s/c Departments & Agencies Subcommittee |
2021-01-13 | House | Ref. to State Government Committee |
2021-01-13 | House | P2C held on desk. |
2021-01-12 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2020-12-03 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB1328 (Crossfiled) 2021-02-22 - Withdrawn.