TN HB0003 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Introduced on November 17 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-03-28 - Action def. in Criminal Justice Committee to first Enhancement Calendar for 2024
Pending: House Criminal Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on November 17 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-03-28 - Action def. in Criminal Justice Committee to first Enhancement Calendar for 2024
Pending: House Criminal Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, expands the offenses of assault against a first responder or nurse and aggravated assault against a first responder or nurse to apply to assaults committed against all healthcare professionals. - Amends TCA Title 39.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 39, relative to assault against certain persons.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-28 | House | Action def. in Criminal Justice Committee to first Enhancement Calendar for 2024 |
2023-03-22 | House | Placed on cal. Criminal Justice Committee for 3/28/2023 |
2023-03-02 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2023-02-07 | House | Action def. in Criminal Justice Committee to Enhancement Calendar |
2023-02-01 | House | Placed on cal. Criminal Justice Committee for 2/7/2023 |
2023-01-31 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2023-01-31 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Criminal Justice Committee |
2023-01-30 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2023-01-25 | House | Placed on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 1/31/2023 |
2023-01-12 | House | Assigned to s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee |
2023-01-12 | House | Ref. to Criminal Justice Committee |
2023-01-11 | House | P2C held on desk, pending appointment of Standing Committees |
2023-01-10 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2022-11-17 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB0026 (Crossfiled) 2023-03-14 - Failed in Senate Judiciary Committee