SD SJR501 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 54-0)
Status: Passed on March 4 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-04 - Delivered to the Secretary of State S.J. 464
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 54-0)
Status: Passed on March 4 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-04 - Delivered to the Secretary of State S.J. 464
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Proposing and submitting to the voters at the next general election, an amendment to the Constitution of the State of South Dakota, authorizing the state to impose work requirements on certain individuals who are eligible for expanded Medicaid.
Title
Proposing and submitting to the voters at the next general election, an amendment to the Constitution of the State of South Dakota, authorizing the state to impose work requirements on certain individuals who are eligible for expanded Medicaid.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-02-27 - House - Do Pass (Y: 63 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-26 - House - Do Pass (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-25 - Senate - Do Pass (Y: 28 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-01-24 - Senate - Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-26 - House - Do Pass (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-25 - Senate - Do Pass (Y: 28 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-01-24 - Senate - Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-04 | Senate | Delivered to the Secretary of State S.J. 464 |
2024-02-29 | House | Signed by the Speaker H.J. 446 |
2024-02-28 | Senate | Signed by the President S.J. 447 |
2024-02-27 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 63, NAYS 7. H.J. 416 |
2024-02-26 | House | State Affairs Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 11, NAYS 2. |
2024-02-26 | House | Scheduled for hearing H.J. 1 |
2024-01-29 | House | First read in House and referred to House State Affairs H.J. 188 |
2024-01-25 | Senate | Senate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 28, NAYS 4. S.J. 185 |
2024-01-24 | Senate | State Affairs Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 1. |
2024-01-24 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2024-01-09 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate State Affairs S.J. 22 |