SD SJR4 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 29 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-13 - No motion to reconsider S.J. 366
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 29 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-13 - No motion to reconsider S.J. 366
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Rescinding House Joint Resolution 1001, adopted by the Ninetieth Legislature of the State of South Dakota.
Title
Rescinding House Joint Resolution 1001, adopted by the Ninetieth Legislature of the State of South Dakota.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-12 - Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 16 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2019-02-11 - Senate - Senate State Affairs Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - Senate - Senate State Affairs Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-13 | House | No motion to reconsider S.J. 366 |
2019-02-12 | House | Intent to reconsider S.J. 355 |
2019-02-12 | House | Senate Do Pass, Failed, YEAS 16, NAYS 17. S.J. 354 |
2019-02-11 | House | State Affairs Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 5, NAYS 3. S.J. 327 |
2019-02-11 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2019-01-29 | House | First read in Senate and referred to Senate State Affairs S.J. 214 |