SD SJR2 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 23-4)
Status: Engrossed on February 13 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-03-06 - Placed on calendar pursuant to JR 6F-6, Failed, YEAS 33, NAYS 32. H.J. 663
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Proposing and submitting to the voters an amendment to the Constitution of the State of South Dakota, providing for wagering on sporting events.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Proposing and submitting to the voters an amendment to the Constitution of the State of South Dakota, providing for wagering on sporting events.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-06 - House - House Placed on calendar pursuant to JR 6F-6 (Y: 33 N: 32 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2019-03-04 - House - House State Affairs Report out of committee without recommendation (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-04 - House - House State Affairs Reconsidered (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-04 - House - House State Affairs Reconsidered (Y: 6 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2019-03-04 - House - House State Affairs Deferred to the 41st legislative day (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-03-04 - House - House State Affairs Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2019-02-13 - Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 18 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-02-06 - Senate - Senate State Affairs Do Pass Amended (Y: 5 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-06SenatePlaced on calendar pursuant to JR 6F-6, Failed, YEAS 33, NAYS 32. H.J. 663
2019-03-04SenateState Affairs Report out of committee without recommendation, Passed, YEAS 10, NAYS 1.
2019-03-04SenateState Affairs Reconsidered, Passed, YEAS 9, NAYS 2.
2019-03-04SenateState Affairs Reconsidered, Failed, YEAS 6, NAYS 5.
2019-03-04SenateRecalled from committee (Rule 7-7), Passed H.J. 602
2019-03-04SenateState Affairs Deferred to the 41st legislative day, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 3. H.J. 597
2019-03-04SenateState Affairs Do Pass, Failed, YEAS 5, NAYS 5.
2019-03-04SenateScheduled for hearing
2019-02-14SenateFirst read in House and referred to House State Affairs H.J. 416
2019-02-13HouseSenate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 18, NAYS 14. S.J. 369
2019-02-12HouseSenate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 356
2019-02-11HouseSenate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 331
2019-02-08HouseSenate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 320
2019-02-06HouseState Affairs Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 5, NAYS 4. S.J. 274
2019-02-06HouseState Affairs Motion to amend, Passed Amendment j2ca
2019-02-06HouseState Affairs Motion to amend, Passed Amendment j2wa
2019-02-06HouseScheduled for hearing
2019-01-24HouseFirst read in Senate and referred to Senate State Affairs S.J. 168

Subjects


South Dakota State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://sdlegislature.gov/Legislative_Session/Bills/Bill.aspx?Bill=SJR2&Session=2019
Texthttp://sdlegislature.gov/docs/legsession/2019/Bills/SJR2P.pdf
Texthttp://sdlegislature.gov/docs/legsession/2019/Bills/SJR2SST.pdf
Roll Callhttp://sdlegislature.gov/Legislative_Session/Bills/RollCall.aspx?Vote=27837&Session=2019
Roll Callhttp://sdlegislature.gov/Legislative_Session/Bills/RollCall.aspx?Vote=28248&Session=2019
Roll Callhttp://sdlegislature.gov/Legislative_Session/Bills/RollCall.aspx?Vote=29053&Session=2019
Roll Callhttp://sdlegislature.gov/Legislative_Session/Bills/RollCall.aspx?Vote=29054&Session=2019
Roll Callhttp://sdlegislature.gov/Legislative_Session/Bills/RollCall.aspx?Vote=29126&Session=2019
Roll Callhttp://sdlegislature.gov/Legislative_Session/Bills/RollCall.aspx?Vote=29127&Session=2019
Roll Callhttp://sdlegislature.gov/Legislative_Session/Bills/RollCall.aspx?Vote=29128&Session=2019
Roll Callhttp://sdlegislature.gov/Legislative_Session/Bills/RollCall.aspx?Vote=29271&Session=2019

Bill Comments

feedback