SD SJR1 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on March 7 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-07 - Delivered to the Secretary of State S.J. 736
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on March 7 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-07 - Delivered to the Secretary of State S.J. 736
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Proposing and submitting to the electors at the next general election an amendment to the Constitution of the State of South Dakota, relating to amendments to the Constitution.
Title
Proposing and submitting to the electors at the next general election an amendment to the Constitution of the State of South Dakota, relating to amendments to the Constitution.
Sponsors
Sen. Jim Bolin [R] | Rep. Ernie Otten [R] | Sen. Tim Reed [R] | Rep. Kent Peterson [R] |
Rep. Karen Soli [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-02-27 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 55 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-02-26 - House - House State Affairs Do Pass (Y: 10 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-01-24 - Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 26 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-24 - Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 26 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-22 - Senate - Senate State Affairs Do Pass (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-01-22 - Senate - Senate State Affairs Do Pass (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-26 - House - House State Affairs Do Pass (Y: 10 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-01-24 - Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 26 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-24 - Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 26 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-22 - Senate - Senate State Affairs Do Pass (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-01-22 - Senate - Senate State Affairs Do Pass (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-07 | Senate | Delivered to the Secretary of State S.J. 736 |
2018-03-05 | Senate | Signed by the Speaker H.J. 689 |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Signed by the President S.J. 646 |
2018-02-27 | Senate | House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 55, NAYS 9. H.J. 621 |
2018-02-26 | Senate | State Affairs Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 10, NAYS 2. H.J. 594 |
2018-02-26 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2018-01-25 | Senate | First read in House and referred to House State Affairs H.J. 207 |
2018-01-24 | House | Senate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 26, NAYS 9. S.J. 233 |
2018-01-23 | House | Senate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 197 |
2018-01-22 | House | State Affairs Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 6, NAYS 2. S.J. 168 |
2018-01-22 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2018-01-09 | House | First read in Senate and referred to Senate State Affairs S.J. 25 |