SD SCR9 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 84-14)
Status: Enrolled on February 26 2018 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-26 - House of Representatives Concurred in Resolution, Passed, YEAS 65, NAYS 0. H.J. 598
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on February 26 2018 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-26 - House of Representatives Concurred in Resolution, Passed, YEAS 65, NAYS 0. H.J. 598
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Strengthening the sister-state ties between the State of South Dakota and the Republic of China (Taiwan), supporting the signing of a Bilateral Trade Agreement between Taiwan and the United States, and reaffirming support for increasing Taiwan's international profile.
Title
Strengthening the sister-state ties between the State of South Dakota and the Republic of China (Taiwan), supporting the signing of a Bilateral Trade Agreement between Taiwan and the United States, and reaffirming support for increasing Taiwan's international profile.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-26 - House - House of Representatives Concurred in Resolution (Y: 65 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-02-21 - Senate - Senate Adopt Resolution (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-02-21 - Senate - Senate Adopt Resolution (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-26 | Senate | House of Representatives Concurred in Resolution, Passed, YEAS 65, NAYS 0. H.J. 598 |
2018-02-23 | Senate | House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 571 |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Introduced H.J. 551 |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Senate Adopt Resolution, Passed, YEAS 33, NAYS 0. S.J. 522 |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Senate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 511 |
2018-01-31 | Senate | Introduced S.J. 290 |