SD SCR8 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 20-0)
Status: Enrolled on February 22 2018 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-23 - House of Representatives Concurred in Resolution, Passed, YEAS 53, NAYS 8. H.J. 573
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on February 22 2018 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-23 - House of Representatives Concurred in Resolution, Passed, YEAS 53, NAYS 8. H.J. 573
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Requesting federal natural resource agencies to refrain from designating wilderness areas in South Dakota without approval of the Legislature.
Title
Requesting federal natural resource agencies to refrain from designating wilderness areas in South Dakota without approval of the Legislature.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-23 - House - House of Representatives Concurred in Resolution (Y: 53 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2018-02-22 - House - House Agriculture and Natural Resources Adopt Resolution (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-01 - Senate - Senate Adopt Resolution (Y: 30 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-01 - Senate - Senate Adopt Resolution (Y: 30 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-22 - House - House Agriculture and Natural Resources Adopt Resolution (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-01 - Senate - Senate Adopt Resolution (Y: 30 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-01 - Senate - Senate Adopt Resolution (Y: 30 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-23 | Senate | House of Representatives Concurred in Resolution, Passed, YEAS 53, NAYS 8. H.J. 573 |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Agriculture and Natural Resources Adopt Resolution, Passed, YEAS 11, NAYS 1. H.J. 545 |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2018-02-02 | Senate | Introduced and referred to House Agriculture and Natural Resources H.J. 313 |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Senate Adopt Resolution, Passed, YEAS 30, NAYS 5. S.J. 317 |
2018-01-31 | Senate | Introduced S.J. 288 |