SD SCR607 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 13-2)
Status: Enrolled on March 1 2022 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-01 - House of Representatives Concurred in Resolution, Passed, YEAS 66, NAYS 3. H.J. 506
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on March 1 2022 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-01 - House of Representatives Concurred in Resolution, Passed, YEAS 66, NAYS 3. H.J. 506
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Encouraging the South Dakota High School Activities Association to sanction baseball.
Title
Encouraging the South Dakota High School Activities Association to sanction baseball.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-01 - House - Concurred in Resolution (Y: 66 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-24 - Senate - Adopt Resolution (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-24 - Senate - Adopt Resolution (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-01 | House | House of Representatives Concurred in Resolution, Passed, YEAS 66, NAYS 3. H.J. 506 |
2022-02-28 | House | Committee assignment waived H.J. 488 |
2022-02-25 | House | First Reading House H.J. 476 |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Senate Adopt Resolution, Passed, YEAS 35, NAYS 0. S.J. 378 |
2022-02-23 | Senate | First read in Senate and referral to committee waived pursuant to JR 6D-1 S.J. 327 |