SD SCR607 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 11-0)
Status: Enrolled on March 8 2021 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-08 - House of Representatives Concurred in Resolution as Amended, Passed, YEAS 63, NAYS 5. H.J. 506
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on March 8 2021 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-08 - House of Representatives Concurred in Resolution as Amended, Passed, YEAS 63, NAYS 5. H.J. 506
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Affirming the Legislature's support of the constitutional right to keep and bear arms.
Title
Affirming the Legislature's support of the constitutional right to keep and bear arms.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-08 - House - Concurred in Resolution as Amended (Y: 63 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-03 - Senate - Senate: Adopt Resolution as amended (Y: 33 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-01 - Senate - Senate State Affairs: Do Pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-03 - Senate - Senate: Adopt Resolution as amended (Y: 33 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-01 - Senate - Senate State Affairs: Do Pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-08 | House | House of Representatives Concurred in Resolution as Amended, Passed, YEAS 63, NAYS 5. H.J. 506 |
2021-03-04 | House | First read in House and referral to committee waived pursuant to JR 6D-1 H.J. 494 |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Senate Adopt Resolution as amended, Passed, YEAS 33, NAYS 2. S.J. 390 |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Senate Motion to amend resolution, Passed S.J. 390 Amendment SCR607A |
2021-03-02 | Senate | Remove from Consent Calendar S.J. 376 |
2021-03-01 | Senate | Certified uncontested, placed on consent |
2021-03-01 | Senate | State Affairs Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 9, NAYS 0. |
2021-03-01 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2021-02-23 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate State Affairs S.J. 329 |