SD SCR606 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 16-2)
Status: Enrolled on March 9 2021 - 75% progression
Action: 2021-03-09 - House of Representatives Concurred in Resolution, Passed, YEAS 67, NAYS 0. H.J. 531
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Commending automotive enthusiasts in South Dakota and the Specialty Equipment Market Association for their contributions in preserving classic automobiles and urging the Governor to declare a South Dakota Collector Car Appreciation Week.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Commending automotive enthusiasts in South Dakota and the Specialty Equipment Market Association for their contributions in preserving classic automobiles and urging the Governor to declare a South Dakota Collector Car Appreciation Week.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-03-09 - House - Concurred in Resolution (Y: 67 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-03-04 - Senate - Senate: Do Pass (Y: 31 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-03 - Senate - Certified uncontested, placed on consent (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-03-03 - Senate - Senate Transportation: Do Pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-09HouseHouse of Representatives Concurred in Resolution, Passed, YEAS 67, NAYS 0. H.J. 531
2021-03-08HouseFirst read in House and referral to committee waived pursuant to JR 6D-1 H.J. 507
2021-03-04SenateSenate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 31, NAYS 3. S.J. 418
2021-03-03SenateCertified uncontested, placed on consent, Passed, YEAS 0, NAYS 0.
2021-03-03SenateTransportation Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 6, NAYS 0.
2021-03-03SenateScheduled for hearing
2021-02-22SenateFirst read in Senate and referred to Senate Transportation S.J. 303

South Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback