SD SCR605 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 14-0)
Status: Enrolled on February 28 2022 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-28 - House of Representatives Concurred in Resolution, Passed, YEAS 57, NAYS 7. H.J. 487
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on February 28 2022 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-28 - House of Representatives Concurred in Resolution, Passed, YEAS 57, NAYS 7. H.J. 487
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Celebrating the South Dakota Division of the Izaak Walton League of America for its ideals and accomplishments during one hundred years of conservation leadership.
Title
Celebrating the South Dakota Division of the Izaak Walton League of America for its ideals and accomplishments during one hundred years of conservation leadership.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-28 - House - Concurred in Resolution (Y: 57 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2022-02-24 - House - Do Pass (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-16 - Senate - Adopt Resolution (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-24 - House - Do Pass (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-16 - Senate - Adopt Resolution (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-28 | House | House of Representatives Concurred in Resolution, Passed, YEAS 57, NAYS 7. H.J. 487 |
2022-02-25 | House | Remove from Consent Calendar H.J. 479 |
2022-02-24 | House | Certified uncontested, placed on consent, Passed |
2022-02-24 | House | Agriculture and Natural Resources Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 12, NAYS 0. |
2022-02-24 | House | Scheduled for hearing H.J. 1 |
2022-02-17 | House | First read in House and referred to House Agriculture and Natural Resources H.J. 367 |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Senate Adopt Resolution, Passed, YEAS 35, NAYS 0. S.J. 274 |
2022-02-15 | Senate | First read in Senate and referral to committee waived pursuant to JR 6D-1 S.J. 253 |