SD SCR605 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 10-1)
Status: Enrolled on March 1 2021 - 75% progression
Action: 2021-03-01 - House of Representatives Concurred in Resolution as Amended, Passed, YEAS 55, NAYS 13. H.J. 437
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Supporting the value of public higher education in South Dakota and encouraging continued efforts to ensure that higher education remains affordable for all South Dakotans.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Supporting the value of public higher education in South Dakota and encouraging continued efforts to ensure that higher education remains affordable for all South Dakotans.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-03-01 - House - House of Representatives: Concurred in Resolution as Amended (Y: 55 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Do Pass (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-18 - Senate - Senate Education: Do Pass Amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-01HouseHouse of Representatives Concurred in Resolution as Amended, Passed, YEAS 55, NAYS 13. H.J. 437
2021-02-25HouseCommittee assignment waived H.J. 400
2021-02-24HouseFirst Reading House H.J. 381
2021-02-23SenateSenate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 35, NAYS 0. S.J. 330
2021-02-18SenateCertified uncontested, placed on consent S.J. 1
2021-02-18SenateEducation Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 0. S.J. 1
2021-02-18SenateEducation Motion to amend, Passed S.J. 1 Amendment SCR605A
2021-02-18SenateScheduled for hearing
2021-02-08SenateFirst read in Senate and referred to Senate Education S.J. 207

South Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback