SD SCR604 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 35-5)
Status: Enrolled on February 17 2021 - 75% progression
Action: 2021-02-17 - House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 68, NAYS 0. H.J. 305
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Supporting trade negotiations to remove barriers to country of origin labelling.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Supporting trade negotiations to remove barriers to country of origin labelling.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-17 - House - House of Representatives: Do Pass (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-16 - House - House Agriculture and Natural Resources: Do Pass (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Adopt Resolution (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-02 - Senate - Senate Agriculture and Natural Resources: Do Pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-17HouseHouse of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 68, NAYS 0. H.J. 305
2021-02-16HouseCertified uncontested, placed on consent
2021-02-16HouseAgriculture and Natural Resources Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 12, NAYS 0.
2021-02-16HouseScheduled for hearing
2021-02-04HouseFirst read and referred to House Agriculture and Natural Resources H.J. 208
2021-02-03SenateSenate Adopt Resolution, Passed, YEAS 34, NAYS 0. S.J. 168
2021-02-02SenateAgriculture and Natural Resources Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 6, NAYS 0.
2021-02-02SenateScheduled for hearing
2021-01-26SenateFirst read in Senate and referred to Senate Agriculture and Natural Resources S.J. 113

South Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback