SD SCR603 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on February 16 2022 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-16 - House of Representatives Concurred in Resolution, Passed, YEAS 68, NAYS 0. H.J. 342
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on February 16 2022 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-16 - House of Representatives Concurred in Resolution, Passed, YEAS 68, NAYS 0. H.J. 342
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
To raise awareness about tardive dyskinesia.
Title
To raise awareness about tardive dyskinesia.
Sponsors
Sen. Erin Tobin [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-02-16 - House - Concurred in Resolution (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-07 - Senate - Adopt Resolution (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-07 - Senate - Adopt Resolution (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-16 | House | House of Representatives Concurred in Resolution, Passed, YEAS 68, NAYS 0. H.J. 342 |
2022-02-15 | House | Committee assignment waived H.J. 323 |
2022-02-08 | House | First Reading House H.J. 235 |
2022-02-07 | Senate | Senate Adopt Resolution, Passed, YEAS 35, NAYS 0. S.J. 191 |
2022-02-04 | Senate | First read in Senate and referral to committee waived pursuant to JR 6D-1 S.J. 182 |