SD SCR603 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 35-1)
Status: Enrolled on March 2 2021 - 75% progression
Action: 2021-03-03 - House of Representatives Concurred in Resolution, Passed, YEAS 58, NAYS 11. H.J. 482
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Supporting the establishment of the Economic Development Professionals Association of South Dakota.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Supporting the establishment of the Economic Development Professionals Association of South Dakota.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-03-03 - House - House of Representatives: Concurred in Resolution (Y: 58 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-02 - House - House Local Government: Concurred in Resolution (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Adopt Resolution (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-02 - Senate - Senate Commerce and Energy: Do Pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-03HouseHouse of Representatives Concurred in Resolution, Passed, YEAS 58, NAYS 11. H.J. 482
2021-03-02HouseLocal Government Concurred in Resolution, Passed, YEAS 12, NAYS 0. H.J. 1
2021-03-02HouseScheduled for hearing
2021-02-23HouseLocal Government Deferred to another day, Passed
2021-02-23HouseScheduled for hearing
2021-02-04HouseFirst read and referred to House Local Government H.J. 208
2021-02-03SenateSenate Adopt Resolution, Passed, YEAS 34, NAYS 0. S.J. 168
2021-02-02SenateCommerce and Energy Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 9, NAYS 0. S.J. 1
2021-02-02SenateScheduled for hearing
2021-01-25SenateFirst read in Senate and referred to Senate Commerce and Energy S.J. 101

South Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback