SD SCR602 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 46-0)
Status: Enrolled on February 16 2021 - 75% progression
Action: 2021-02-16 - House of Representatives Concurred in Resolution, Passed, YEAS 60, NAYS 8. H.J. 293
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Supporting a United States Constitutional amendment to retain nine justices on the United States Supreme Court.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Supporting a United States Constitutional amendment to retain nine justices on the United States Supreme Court.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-16 - House - House of Representatives: Concurred in Resolution (Y: 60 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Adopt Resolution (Y: 29 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-02-04 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Do Pass (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-16HouseHouse of Representatives Concurred in Resolution, Passed, YEAS 60, NAYS 8. H.J. 293
2021-02-11HouseHouse of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 284
2021-02-10HouseCommittee assignment waived H.J. 273
2021-02-08HouseFirst Reading H.J. 234
2021-02-05SenateSenate Adopt Resolution, Passed, YEAS 29, NAYS 2. S.J. 200
2021-02-04SenateJudiciary Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 4, NAYS 0. S.J. 3
2021-02-04SenateScheduled for hearing S.J. 1
2021-01-25SenateFirst read in Senate and referred to Senate Judiciary S.J. 101

South Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback