SD SCR601 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 50-0)
Status: Enrolled on January 27 2021 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-01 - House of Representatives Concurred in Resolution as Amended, Passed, YEAS 62, NAYS 8. H.J. 165
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on January 27 2021 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-01 - House of Representatives Concurred in Resolution as Amended, Passed, YEAS 62, NAYS 8. H.J. 165
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Urging the members of South Dakota's congressional delegation to vote against any act admitting the District of Columbia as a separate state.
Title
Urging the members of South Dakota's congressional delegation to vote against any act admitting the District of Columbia as a separate state.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-01 - House - House of Representatives: Concurred in Resolution as Amended (Y: 62 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-27 - Senate - Senate: Adopt Resolution as amended (Y: 32 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-25 - Senate - Senate State Affairs: Adopt Resolution as amended (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-27 - Senate - Senate: Adopt Resolution as amended (Y: 32 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-25 - Senate - Senate State Affairs: Adopt Resolution as amended (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-01 | House | House of Representatives Concurred in Resolution as Amended, Passed, YEAS 62, NAYS 8. H.J. 165 |
2021-01-28 | House | First read in House and referral to committee waived pursuant to JR 6D-1 H.J. 147 |
2021-01-27 | Senate | Senate Adopt Resolution as amended, Passed, YEAS 32, NAYS 3. S.J. 122 |
2021-01-25 | Senate | State Affairs Adopt Resolution as amended, Passed, YEAS 8, NAYS 1. |
2021-01-25 | Senate | State Affairs Motion to amend, Passed Amendment SCR601A |
2021-01-25 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2021-01-21 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate State Affairs S.J. 87 |