SD SCR601 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 19-5)
Status: Enrolled on March 2 2020 - 75% progression
Action: 2020-03-02 - House of Representatives Concurred in Resolution as Amended, Passed, YEAS 60, NAYS 3. H.J. 442
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Supporting trade negotiations to remove barriers to country of origin labelling.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Supporting trade negotiations to remove barriers to country of origin labelling.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-02 - House - House of Representatives Concurred in Resolution as Amended (Y: 60 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2020-02-06 - Senate - Senate Adopt Resolution (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-04 - Senate - Senate Agriculture and Natural Resources Do Pass Amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-02HouseHouse of Representatives Concurred in Resolution as Amended, Passed, YEAS 60, NAYS 3. H.J. 442
2020-02-27HouseFirst read in House and referral to committee waived pursuant to JR 6D-1 H.J. 420
2020-02-07SenateFirst Reading House H.J. 227
2020-02-06HouseSenate Adopt Resolution, Passed, YEAS 34, NAYS 0. S.J. 152
2020-02-04HouseAgriculture and Natural Resources Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 0.
2020-02-04HouseAgriculture and Natural Resources Motion to amend, Passed Amendment SCR601B
2020-02-04HouseScheduled for hearing
2020-01-28HouseFirst read in Senate and referred to Senate Agriculture and Natural Resources S.J. 97

Subjects


South Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback