SD SCR4 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 15-0)
Status: Enrolled on January 14 2019 - 75% progression
Action: 2019-01-14 - House of Representatives Concurred in Resolution as Amended, Passed, YEAS 55, NAYS 13. H.J. 47
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Commending and thanking the men and women of the United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement (ICE), urging Congress and the President to fund construction of steel barriers and border control impediments along with the strengthening of current border control infrastructure, and urging Congress and the President to ensure compliance with and enforcement of federal immigration laws.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Commending and thanking the men and women of the United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement (ICE), urging Congress and the President to fund construction of steel barriers and border control impediments along with the strengthening of current border control infrastructure, and urging Congress and the President to ensure compliance with and enforcement of federal immigration laws.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-01-14 - House - House of Representatives Concurred in Resolution as Amended (Y: 55 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-01-10 - Senate - Senate Motion to amend resolution (Y: 20 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-01-10 - Senate - Senate Adopt Resolution as amended (Y: 28 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-01-10 - Senate - Senate Motion to amend resolution (Y: 20 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-01-14SenateHouse of Representatives Concurred in Resolution as Amended, Passed, YEAS 55, NAYS 13. H.J. 47
2019-01-11SenateIntroduced H.J. 41
2019-01-10SenateSenate Motion to amend resolution, Passed, YEAS 20, NAYS 13. S.J. 53 Amendment c4jtb
2019-01-10SenateSenate Adopt Resolution as amended, Passed, YEAS 28, NAYS 5. S.J. 52
2019-01-10SenateSenate Motion to amend resolution, Passed, YEAS 20, NAYS 13. S.J. 52 Amendment c4jb
2019-01-09SenateSenate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 35
2019-01-08SenateIntroduced S.J. 16

Subjects


South Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback