SD SCR4 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 47-3)
Status: Enrolled on January 31 2017 - 75% progression
Action: 2017-01-31 - House of Representatives Concurred in Resolution as Amended, Passed, YEAS 65, NAYS 0. H.J. 224
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Recognizing and finding that pornography is a public health crisis leading to a broad spectrum of individual and public health impacts and societal harms.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Recognizing and finding that pornography is a public health crisis leading to a broad spectrum of individual and public health impacts and societal harms.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-01-31 - House - House of Representatives Concurred in Resolution as Amended (Y: 65 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-01-24 - Senate - Senate Adopt Resolution as amended (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-01-31SenateHouse of Representatives Concurred in Resolution as Amended, Passed, YEAS 65, NAYS 0. H.J. 224
2017-01-26SenateHouse of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 208
2017-01-25SenateIntroduced H.J. 189
2017-01-24SenateSenate Adopt Resolution as amended, Passed, YEAS 35, NAYS 0. S.J. 176
2017-01-24SenateSenate Motion to amend resolution, Passed S.J. 177 Amendment c4ba
2017-01-23SenateIntroduced S.J. 162

Subjects


South Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback