SD SCR4 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 28-7)
Status: Enrolled on February 3 2015 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-02-03 - House of Representatives Concurred in Resolution, Passed, YEAS 64, NAYS 5. H.J. 257
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on February 3 2015 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-02-03 - House of Representatives Concurred in Resolution, Passed, YEAS 64, NAYS 5. H.J. 257
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Urging Congress to support equity and sales tax fairness.
Title
Urging Congress to support equity and sales tax fairness.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
House - House of Representatives Concurred in Resolution (Y: 64 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Adopt Resolution (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Adopt Resolution (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-02-03 | House | House of Representatives Concurred in Resolution, Passed, YEAS 64, NAYS 5. H.J. 257 |
2015-01-30 | House | Introduced H.J. 245 |
2015-01-29 | House | Senate Adopt Resolution, Passed, YEAS 34, NAYS 0. S.J. 230 |
2015-01-28 | House | Introduced S.J. 206 |