SD SCR4 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 28-6)
Status: Enrolled on February 3 2011 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-02-03 - House of Representatives Concurred in Resolution, Passed, YEAS 66, NAYS 0. H.J. 277
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on February 3 2011 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-02-03 - House of Representatives Concurred in Resolution, Passed, YEAS 66, NAYS 0. H.J. 277
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Endorsing the adoption of a national flag to honor and remember those who died while serving in America's military.
Title
Endorsing the adoption of a national flag to honor and remember those who died while serving in America's military.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
House - House of Representatives Concurred in Resolution (Y: 66 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Adopt Resolution (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Adopt Resolution (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-02-03 | House of Representatives Concurred in Resolution, Passed, YEAS 66, NAYS 0. H.J. 277 | |
2011-02-02 | Introduced H.J. 264 | |
2011-02-01 | Senate Adopt Resolution, Passed, YEAS 34, NAYS 0. S.J. 277 | |
2011-01-31 | Introduced S.J. 237 |