SD SCR3 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 66-37-1)
Status: Enrolled on March 1 2010 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-01 - House of Representatives Concurred in Resolution, Passed, YEAS 69, NAYS 0. H.J. 629
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on March 1 2010 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-01 - House of Representatives Concurred in Resolution, Passed, YEAS 69, NAYS 0. H.J. 629
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Commemorating the 100th anniversary of the South Dakota State Capitol.
Title
Commemorating the 100th anniversary of the South Dakota State Capitol.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
House - House of Representatives Concurred in Resolution (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Adopt Resolution (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Adopt Resolution (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-01 | House of Representatives Concurred in Resolution, Passed, YEAS 69, NAYS 0. H.J. 629 | |
2010-02-25 | Introduced H.J. 615 | |
2010-02-24 | Senate Adopt Resolution, Passed, YEAS 34, NAYS 0. S.J. 457 | |
2010-02-23 | Introduced S.J. 432 |