SD SCR2 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 13-2)
Status: Engrossed on January 14 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-01-15 - Introduced H.J. 66
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

To provide for legislative task forces to study, report, and develop and consider recommendations and proposed legislation regarding sustainable improvements to the continuum of mental health services available in the state.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To provide for legislative task forces to study, report, and develop and consider recommendations and proposed legislation regarding sustainable improvements to the continuum of mental health services available in the state.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-01-14 - Senate - Senate Adopt Resolution (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-01-15SenateIntroduced H.J. 66
2019-01-14SenateSenate Adopt Resolution, Passed, YEAS 35, NAYS 0. S.J. 72
2019-01-09SenateSenate Deferred to another day, Passed
2019-01-08SenateIntroduced S.J. 14

Subjects


South Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback