SD SCR2 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 28-0)
Status: Enrolled on January 30 2018 - 75% progression
Action: 2018-01-30 - House of Representatives Concurred in Resolution, Passed, YEAS 59, NAYS 9. H.J. 221
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Endorsing the right to work provisions in the South Dakota Constitution and in the Labor Management Relations Act that prohibit forced union membership.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Endorsing the right to work provisions in the South Dakota Constitution and in the Labor Management Relations Act that prohibit forced union membership.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-01-30 - House - House of Representatives Concurred in Resolution (Y: 59 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-01-30 - House - House of Representatives Concurred in Resolution (Y: 59 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-01-22 - Senate - Senate Adopt Resolution (Y: 28 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-01-22 - Senate - Senate Adopt Resolution (Y: 28 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-01-30SenateHouse of Representatives Concurred in Resolution, Passed, YEAS 59, NAYS 9. H.J. 221
2018-01-25SenateHouse of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 194
2018-01-24SenateHouse of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 171
2018-01-23SenateIntroduced H.J. 146
2018-01-22SenateSenate Adopt Resolution, Passed, YEAS 28, NAYS 5. S.J. 170
2018-01-19SenateSenate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 151
2018-01-18SenateIntroduced S.J. 132

South Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback