SD SCR2 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 78-25)
Status: Enrolled on February 1 2011 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-02-01 - House of Representatives Concurred in Resolution, Passed, YEAS 68, NAYS 1. H.J. 245
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on February 1 2011 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-02-01 - House of Representatives Concurred in Resolution, Passed, YEAS 68, NAYS 1. H.J. 245
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Urging the United States Congress to appropriate $35 million in fiscal year 2012 for the Lewis and Clark Regional Water System
Title
Urging the United States Congress to appropriate $35 million in fiscal year 2012 for the Lewis and Clark Regional Water System
Sponsors
Roll Calls
House - House of Representatives Concurred in Resolution (Y: 68 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Adopt Resolution (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Adopt Resolution (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-02-01 | House of Representatives Concurred in Resolution, Passed, YEAS 68, NAYS 1. H.J. 245 | |
2011-01-31 | Introduced H.J. 216 | |
2011-01-27 | Senate Adopt Resolution, Passed, YEAS 35, NAYS 0. S.J. 222 | |
2011-01-26 | Introduced S.J. 211 |